Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Crespo, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
20 Dec 1490AppointedBishop of Castro [di Sardegna], Italy
2 Oct 1493AppointedBishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy
8 Dec 1503AppointedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy
25 Dec 1506DiedBishop of Ales e Terralba, Italy

MicroData Summary for Juan Crespo
Bishop Juan Crespo O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Ales e Terralba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceValencia, Diocese of Valencia, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 261, and Page 121
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 324
  • bp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1490, Number 27*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast