Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stefan Lewiński

Deceased

Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Dec 1736Born
17 Aug 178447.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
17 Aug 178447.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tegea
4 Dec 178447.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tegea
9 Dec 178750.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
1791²54.0ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Kyiv-Halyč {Kiev} (Ukrainian), Ukraine
26 Jun 179760.5SucceededBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine
23 Jan 180669.0DiedBishop of Lutzk e Ostrog (Ukrainian), Ukraine

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stefan Lewiński:
Bishop Stefan Lewiński (born , died ) Bishop of Lutzk e Ostrog

  • a bishop for 21.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,907
  • b: Hierarchy of the Kyivan Church 861-1990, Page 255, and Page 265

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 16 Feb 2015