Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Dacio (d’Anio)

Deceased

Bishop of Orihuela, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Oct 1527Born
13 Jan 157850.2AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
19 May 158557.5DiedBishop of Orihuela, Spain

MicroData Summary for Tomás Dacio (d’Anio)
Bishop Tomás Dacio (d’Anio) (born , died ) Bishop of Orihuela

EventPlace
Death PlaceValencia, Archdiocese of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 90, Number 553
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1578, Number 2*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast