Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alvise Cornaro

Deceased

Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Jan 1589AppointedTitular Bishop of Paphus
20 Feb 1589AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
5 Mar 1589Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Paphus
4 Oct 1590SucceededBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy
31 Oct 1594DiedBishop of Padova {Padua}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Alvise Cornaro
Bishop Alvise Cornaro (died ) Bishop of Padova {Padua}

EventPlace
Ordained BishopSan Giorgio Maggiore, Venezia, Patriarchate of Venezia {Venice}

  • a bishop for 5.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 267, and Page 269
  • ob/c2: AT, 9 Jul 2016
  • b: CB, 10 Jul 2016
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 18,961
  • ob: CB, 24 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 25 Jan 2017