Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop William of Corbeuil, C.R.S.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Canterbury, England


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1070¹BornCorbeil, France
1118²48.0ProfessedMember of Confederation of Canons Regular of St. Augustine
4 Feb 112353.0AppointedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
18 Feb 112353.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain
21 Nov 113666.8DiedArchbishop of Canterbury, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William of Corbeuil
Archbishop William of Corbeuil C.R.S.A. (born 1070, died ) Archbishop of Canterbury

  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 1, Page 8
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 43
  • crsa/bp/bd/prof: CB, 14 Mar 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Mar 2016