Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Simon

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England


Events

DateEventTitle
7 May 1125AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
23 May 1125Ordained PriestPriest
24 May 1125Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
20 Mar 1150DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Simon :
Bishop Simon (died ) Bishop of Worcester

  • a priest for 24.8 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 44
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 49

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014