Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernulf

Deceased

Bishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
15 Aug 1114AppointedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
26 Dec 1115Ordained BishopBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain
15 Mar 1124DiedBishop of Rochester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Ernulf
Bishop Ernulf (died ) Bishop of Rochester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 43
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 558
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 93, Number 7,854

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast