Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henry of Blois

Deceased

Bishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
11 Oct 1129AppointedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
17 Nov 1129Ordained BishopBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain
9 Aug 1171DiedBishop of Winchester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Henry of Blois
Bishop Henry of Blois (died ) Bishop of Winchester

  • a bishop for 41.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 44
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 7

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018