Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Boccabella, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ferentino, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Dec 1435AppointedBishop of Ferentino, Italy
13 Feb 1436Ordained BishopBishop of Ferentino, Italy
24 Jan 1445DiedBishop of Ferentino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio Boccabella
Bishop Antonio Boccabella O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Ferentino

  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 204, Number 16,809
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast