Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Côme (Cosme) Clausse de Marchaumont

Deceased

Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1548¹Born
17 Nov 157426.8AppointedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
2 Feb 157527.0Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France
1 Apr 162476.2DiedBishop of Chalons-sur-Marne, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Côme (Cosme) Clausse de Marchaumont (VIAF: 201132548)
Bishop Côme (Cosme) Clausse de Marchaumont (born 1548, died ) Bishop of Chalons-sur-Marne

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Denis, Reims, Archdiocese of Reims
Death PlaceChalons-sur-Marne, Diocese of Chalons-sur-Marne

  • a bishop for 49.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 159
  • ob/c2+: CB, 4 Feb 2015
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1575, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 10 Nov 2017