Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicolas Pseaume, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun, France


Events

DateEventTitle
13 Jun 1548AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
26 Aug 1548Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
10 Aug 1575DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Nicolas Pseaume (VIAF: 44335747)
Bishop Nicolas Pseaume O.P. (died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a bishop for 26.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 335
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1548, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 25 Sep 2017