Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Éric de Lorraine, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

Member of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1576BornVandémont
9 Jun 159317.2AppointedBishop of Verdun, France
1 Sep 160226.4Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
1610¹33.7ResignedBishop of Verdun, France
24 Dec 161135.7ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
27 Apr 162347.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Verdun, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Éric de Lorraine:
Bishop Éric de Lorraine O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Verdun

  • a bishop for 20.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 12 Feb 2015