Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giuseppe Cigala (Cicala), C.R. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Messina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1610¹BornPalermo
30 Jun 167060.4AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
6 Jul 167060.5Ordained BishopBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
9 May 167868.3AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
28 Sep 168575.7DiedArchbishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Cigala (Cicala):
Archbishop Giuseppe Cigala (Cicala) C.R. (born 1610, died ) Archbishop of Messina

  • a bishop for 15.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 261, and Page 265
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1670, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015