Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Antonio da San Michele (Gaspar) Rodríguez, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Lanciano, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1552AppointedBishop of Montemarano, Italy
31 Dec 1552Ordained BishopBishop of Montemarano, Italy
20 Oct 1570AppointedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy
1 Nov 1578DiedArchbishop of Lanciano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Antonio da San Michele (Gaspar) Rodríguez
Archbishop Antonio da San Michele (Gaspar) Rodríguez O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop of Lanciano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSpain
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Buried Place (Original)Cathedral, Lanciano, Archdiocese of Lanciano

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 218, and Page 249
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1,500, Page 64, Number 367
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,552, Number 25*
  • ob/c23: AT, 16 Feb 2020
  • c4: CB, 16 Feb 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast