Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Anselmo Carminati

Deceased

Bishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1538¹Born
26 Aug 159658.6AppointedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
22 Sep 159658.7Ordained BishopBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy
6 Jul 160466.5DiedBishop of Alba (Pompea), Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Anselmo Carminati
Bishop Giovanni Anselmo Carminati (born 1538, died ) Bishop of Alba (Pompea)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMantova, Diocese of Mantova
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 7.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 75
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1596, Number 15*
  • ob/c2/loc/d: AT, 7 Oct 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 6 Oct 2018; Data: 9 Oct 2018

Quantcast