Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Innico Cardinal Caracciolo (Sr.)

Deceased

Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Mar 1607Born
15 Feb 166658.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
7 Mar 166760.0AppointedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
7 Mar 166760.0Elevated to Cardinal
18 Jul 166760.3InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
9 Oct 166760.5Ordained BishopArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
30 Jan 168577.8DiedArchbishop of Napoli {Naples}, Italy

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Innico Caracciolo (Sr.) (VIAF: 276532421)
Innico Cardinal Caracciolo (Sr.) (born , died ) Archbishop of Napoli {Naples}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli

  • a bishop for 17.3 years
  • a cardinal for 18.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 15 Feb 1666
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1667, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast