Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Antonio Curzio

Deceased

Bishop of Bovino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635BornNapoli
30 Jun 167035.5AppointedBishop of Bovino, Italy
20 Jul 167035.6Ordained BishopBishop of Bovino, Italy
Aug 167237.6DiedBishop of Bovino, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Antonio Curzio:
Bishop Francesco Antonio Curzio Bishop of Bovino

  • a bishop for 2.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,439
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 125

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013