Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Decio Caracciolo Rosso

Deceased

Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)


Events

DateEventTitle
21 Sep 1577Ordained PriestPriest
3 Jul 1606AppointedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
1 Oct 1606Ordained BishopArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy
27 May 1613DiedArchbishop of Bari (-Canosa), Italy

MicroData Summary for Decio Caracciolo Rosso:
Archbishop Decio Caracciolo Rosso (died ) Archbishop of Bari (-Canosa)

  • a priest for 35.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 110
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 10 Feb 2015