Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanbattista Caracciolo, C.R.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Jan 1646³Born
21 Sep 166923.7Ordained PriestPriest of Clerks Regular of Somasca
15 Jan 170357.0AppointedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
21 Jan 170357.0Ordained BishopBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy
5 Nov 171468.8DiedBishop of Calvi Risorta, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanbattista Caracciolo
Bishop Giovanbattista Caracciolo C.R.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Calvi Risorta

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMontesardo, Diocese of Alessano
Ordained BishopSan Nicola de Cesarini, Church, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceNapoli, Archdiocese of Napoli {Naples}

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 138
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 29
  • ob/c2: AT, 19 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast