Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giuseppe Candido

Deceased

Bishop of Lipari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1591¹BornSyracusan
Aug 1627²36.6Ordained PriestPriest
29 Nov 162736.9AppointedBishop of Lipari, Italy
2 Jan 162837.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lipari, Italy
9 Dec 164453.9DiedBishop of Lipari, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giuseppe Candido:
Bishop Giuseppe Candido (died ) Bishop of Lipari

  • a priest for 17.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 222
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 90, Number 537

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013