Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Revellis

Deceased

Bishop of Wien


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Oct 1523SelectedBishop of Wien, Austria
6 Apr 1524ConfirmedBishop of Wien, Austria
7 Aug 1527Ordained BishopBishop of Wien, Austria
27 Dec 1529DiedBishop of Wien, Austria

MicroData Summary for Johann von Revellis:
Bishop Johann von Revellis (died ) Bishop of Wien

  • a bishop for 2.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 333
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,913

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 11 Jan 2014; data: 11 Jan 2014