Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matteo Orsini, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Chiusi


Events

DateEventTitle
1302AppointedBishop of Imola, Italy
5 Aug 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Imola, Italy
12 Jan 1317AppointedBishop of Chiusi, Italy
15 Jun 1322DiedBishop of Chiusi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Matteo Orsini:
Bishop Matteo Orsini O.P. (died ) Bishop of Chiusi

  • a bishop for 19.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 189, Number 15,362
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 284, and Page 195

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013