Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Filippo Bartolomei

Deceased

Bishop of Hierapetra, Greece


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Apr 1469AppointedBishop of Ario, Greece
8 Apr 1470Ordained BishopBishop of Ario, Greece
14 Apr 1480AppointedBishop of Hierapetra, Greece
1501¹DiedBishop of Hierapetra, Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Filippo Bartolomei
Bishop Filippo Bartolomei (died 1501) Bishop of Hierapetra

EventPlace
Ordained BishopS. Michel in burgo S. Petri, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 30.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 94, and Page 164
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,509
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1470, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast