Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Buti (Buzzi)

Deceased

Bishop of Carpentras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Sep 1634BornRoma
19 Oct 168147.1Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jan 169156.3AppointedBishop of Carpentras, France
5 Aug 169156.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carpentras, France
22 Apr 171075.6DiedBishop of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Laurent Buti (Buzzi):
Bishop Laurent Buti (Buzzi) (born , died ) Bishop of Carpentras

  • a priest for 28.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013