Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Friedrich von Hoym

Deceased

Archbishop of Magdeburg


Events

DateEventTitle
22 Mar 1357AppointedBishop of Merseburg, Germany
Apr 1357³Ordained BishopBishop of Merseburg, Germany
23 Feb 1382AppointedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany
9 Nov 1382DiedArchbishop of Magdeburg, Germany

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Friedrich von Hoym (VIAF: 80560336)
Archbishop Friedrich von Hoym (died ) Archbishop of Magdeburg

  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 336, and Page 321
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,772
  • ob/c2: ATh

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 11 Feb 2016