Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mikolaj Brolinski

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Titular Bishop of Lacedaemonia


Events

DateEventTitle
30 Aug 1532AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland
30 Aug 1532AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
24 Feb 1533Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacedaemonia
3 May 1546DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Płock, Poland

Note(s): ⁶ Before

MicroData Summary for Mikolaj Brolinski
Bishop Mikolaj Brolinski (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Płock

EventPlace
Ordained BishopPultusk

  • a bishop for 13.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,392
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 217
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,533, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast