Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stanisław Oleśnicki

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1469¹Born
25 Jun 153869.4AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
15 Dec 153869.9Ordained BishopBishop of Poznań, Poland
27 Apr 153970.3DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Stanisław Oleśnicki
Bishop Stanisław Oleśnicki (born 1469, died ) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Ordained BishopGochaczev

  • a bishop for .3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 279
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1538, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast