Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Bonetti (Berosi)

Deceased

Bishop of Narni, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1576Born
31 Jul 160629.8AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
20 Aug 160629.9Ordained BishopBishop of Narni, Italy
Jul 163255.8DiedBishop of Narni, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Bonetti (Berosi)
Bishop Giovanni Battista Bonetti (Berosi) (born , died Jul 1632) Bishop of Narni

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReggio Emilia, Diocese of Reggio Emilia
Ordained BishopSistine, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}

  • a bishop for 25.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1606, Number 37
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 252
  • ob/c2+: AT, 30 Dec 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,555

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast