Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Battista Toschi

Deceased

Bishop of Rieti


Events

DateEventTitle
28 May 1601AppointedBishop of Narni, Italy
31 Jul 1606AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
29 Mar 1621AppointedBishop of Rieti, Italy
13 Dec 1633DiedBishop of Rieti, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Toschi:
Bishop Giovanni Battista Toschi (died ) Bishop of Rieti

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 337, and Page 293
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 3, Page 253

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013