Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. William FitzHerbert

Deceased

Archbishop of York, England


Events

DateEventTitle
Jan 1141³AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
26 Sep 1143Ordained BishopArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
Jan 1147³ResignedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
20 Dec 1153AppointedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
8 Jun 1154DiedArchbishop of York, England, Great Britain
18 Mar 1226Canonized

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. William FitzHerbert
Archbishop St. William FitzHerbert (died ) Archbishop of York

  • a bishop for 10.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 46
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 99, and Page 100
  • b/c2+: CB, 15 Feb 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 15 Feb 2016