Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop António José Cordeiro

Deceased

Bishop of Aveiro, Portugal


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1750³Born
10 Jan 177322.6Ordained DeaconDeacon
5 Jun 177323.0Ordained PriestPriest
20 Dec 180050.5SelectedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
20 Jul 180151.1ConfirmedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
8 Nov 180151.4Ordained BishopBishop of Aveiro, Portugal
17 Jul 181363.1DiedBishop of Aveiro, Portugal

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for António José Cordeiro
Bishop António José Cordeiro (born , died ) Bishop of Aveiro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoimbra

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1801, Number 27
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 99

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast