Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Félix Bernuy Zapata y Mendoza

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1672BornBenammego
20 Nov 172452.2AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
14 Jan 172552.4Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
23 May 173057.7DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Félix Bernuy Zapata y Mendoza:
Bishop Félix Bernuy Zapata y Mendoza (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 42, Number 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1725, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 140

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015