Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop St. Anno von Köln

Deceased

Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1010¹Born
1056¹46.0AppointedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
3 Mar 105646.1Ordained BishopArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
4 Dec 107565.9DiedArchbishop of Köln {Cologne}, Germany
29 Apr 1183Canonized

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for St. Anno von Köln (VIAF: 18013040)
Archbishop St. Anno von Köln (born 1010, died ) Archbishop of Köln {Cologne}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAltsteußlingen

  • a bishop for 19.7 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 18 Apr 2017