Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Insegna, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Assisi


Events

DateEventTitle
10 Aug 1483AppointedBishop of Assisi, Italy
14 Sep 1483Ordained BishopBishop of Assisi, Italy
10 Dec 1495³DiedBishop of Assisi, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Insegna:
Bishop Francesco Insegna O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Assisi

  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 2, Page 97
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,395

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013