Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Robert Barry

Deceased

Bishop of Cork and Cloyne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1588¹Born
8 Apr 164759.2AppointedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
25 Mar 164860.2Ordained BishopBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland
6 Jul 166274.5DiedBishop of Cork and Cloyne, Ireland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Robert Barry
Bishop Robert Barry (born 1588, died ) Bishop of Cork and Cloyne

  • a bishop for 14.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 163
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1648, Number 7
  • bd: Website of the Diocese, 25 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 26 Apr 2016