Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henri de Baradat

Deceased

Bishop of Noyon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1598¹BornDamery
7 Dec 162527.9SelectedBishop of Noyon, France
30 Mar 162628.2ConfirmedBishop of Noyon, France
2 Aug 162628.5Ordained BishopBishop of Noyon, France
25 Aug 166062.6DiedBishop of Noyon, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Henri de Baradat:
Bishop Henri de Baradat (died ) Bishop of Noyon

  • a bishop for 34.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 262
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1626, Number 20

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.3, 8 Feb 2015; Data: 1 Mar 2015