Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Balma, O.M.V. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Cagliari


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jan 1817BornPinerolo
5 Jul 183215.5ProfessedMember of Oblates of the Virgin Mary
Jul 1839³22.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of the Virgin Mary
5 Sep 184831.6AppointedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegý, Myanmar
5 Sep 184831.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
15 Apr 184932.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ptolemais in Phoenicia
9 Sep 185538.6ResignedVicar Apostolic of Ava e Pegý, Myanmar
27 Oct 187154.8AppointedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy
5 Apr 188164.2DiedArchbishop of Cagliari, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Antonio Balma:
Archbishop Giovanni Antonio Balma O.M.V. (born , died ) Archbishop of Cagliari

  • a priest for 41.8 years
  • a bishop for 32.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 171, and Page 471

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013