Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tommaso Bichi

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Oristano, Italy

Titular Bishop of Rhesaina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 May 1813Born
31 Dec 183724.6Ordained PriestPriest of Oristano, Italy
16 Dec 188067.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Oristano, Italy
16 Dec 188067.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
6 Mar 188167.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rhesaina
1901¹87.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Oristano, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tommaso Bichi
Bishop Tommaso Bichi (born , died 1901) Auxiliary Bishop of Oristano

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOristano, Archdiocese of Oristano
Ordained BishopCathedral, Oristano, Archdiocese of Oristano

  • a priest for 63.0 years
  • a bishop for 19.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 481
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast