Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Tobie El-Khazen

Deceased

Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite)


Events

DateEventTitle
1733²AppointedBishop of Nablus (Maronite), Palestine
1733²Ordained BishopBishop of Nablus (Maronite), Palestine
1736²AppointedBishop of Cipro (Maronite), Cyprus
1755²AppointedBishop of Tripoli del Libano {Tarabulus} (Maronite)
28 Feb 1756SelectedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
28 Mar 1757ConfirmedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
19 May 1766DiedPatriarch of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tobie El-Khazen:
Patriarch Tobie El-Khazen (died ) Patriarch of Antiochia {Antioch}

  • a bishop for 33.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: CB, 4 May 2013
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Number 12,976
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013