Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abdallah Qaraali, O.L.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1672Born
17 Sep 171644.0Ordained BishopBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon
6 Jan 174269.3DiedBishop of Beirut {Bairut} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary for Abdallah Qaraali:
Bishop Abdallah Qaraali O.L.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Beirut {Bairut}

  • a bishop for 25.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 212, Number 17,583

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013