Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Camillo Olario (Aulari, Ozario)

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Aug 1602AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
8 Sep 1602Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
11 Jan 1607DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Camillo Olario (Aulari, Ozario):
Bishop Camillo Olario (Aulari, Ozario) (died ) Bishop of Bobbio

  • a bishop for 4.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 117
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 39, Number 200
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 136
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1602, Number 21

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015