Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Gauscelin Cardinal de Jean

Deceased

Cardinal-Bishop of Albano


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Dec 1316AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi Marcellino e Pietro
17 Dec 1316Elevated to Cardinal
18 Dec 1327AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Albano
3 Aug 1348DiedCardinal-Bishop of Albano

MicroData Summary for Gauscelin de Jean:
Gauscelin Cardinal de Jean (died ) Cardinal-Bishop of Albano

  • a cardinal for 31.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1316

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 27 Jan 2014