Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Juan de Aragón

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1292¹Born
14 Nov 131927.9AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
Aug 1320²28.6Ordained BishopArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
17 Aug 132836.6AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
27 Aug 132836.7AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
18 Aug 133442.6DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Juan de Aragón:
Archbishop Juan de Aragón (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

  • a bishop for 14.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 487, and Page 479
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 108, Number 9,439
  • b/c2+: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 302, Number 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014