Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jimeno de Luna

Deceased

Archbishop of Toledo, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
5 Jul 1296AppointedBishop of Zaragoza, Spain
26 Mar 1317AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
17 Aug 1328AppointedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain
1338¹DiedArchbishop of Toledo, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jimeno de Luna
Archbishop Jimeno de Luna (died 1338) Archbishop of Toledo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 479, and Page 487
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast