Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pedro Lopez de Luna

Deceased

Archbishop of Zaragoza


Events

DateEventTitle
26 Mar 1317AppointedBishop of Zaragoza, Spain
14 Jul 1318AppointedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain
22 Feb 1345DiedArchbishop of Zaragoza, Spain

MicroData Summary for Pedro Lopez de Luna:
Archbishop Pedro Lopez de Luna (died ) Archbishop of Zaragoza

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 153

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 28 Jan 2014