Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justino Antolínez Burgos

Deceased

Bishop of Tortosa


Events

DateEventTitle
7 Jul 1627AppointedBishop of Tortosa, Spain
8 Jul 1627Ordained BishopBishop of Tortosa, Spain
9 Jul 1637DiedBishop of Tortosa, Spain

MicroData Summary for Justino Antolínez Burgos:
Bishop Justino Antolínez Burgos (died ) Bishop of Tortosa

  • a bishop for 10.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 114, Number 10,052
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 201, Number 16,402

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013