Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Riccardo Annibaleschi della Molara

Deceased

Bishop of Veroli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1634¹BornRoma
19 Mar 167541.2Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Mar 167541.2Ordained PriestPriest
27 May 167541.4AppointedBishop of Veroli, Italy
3 Jun 167541.4Ordained BishopBishop of Veroli, Italy
Mar 1689³55.1DiedBishop of Veroli, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Riccardo Annibaleschi della Molara:
Bishop Riccardo Annibaleschi della Molara , Bishop of Veroli

  • a priest for 13.9 years
  • a bishop for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 412
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1675, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 11 Apr 2015; Data: 13 Apr 2015