Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Georg Altdorfer

Deceased

Bishop of Chiemsee, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1437Born
27 Oct 147740.8AppointedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
1 Mar 147841.1Ordained BishopBishop of Chiemsee, Germany
2 May 149558.3DiedBishop of Chiemsee, Germany

MicroData Summary for Georg Altdorfer (VIAF: 59896093)
Bishop Georg Altdorfer (born 1437, died ) Bishop of Chiemsee

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLandshut
Ordained BishopSalzburg, Archdiocese of Salzburg, Austria

  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 127
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 1

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Jan 2019

Quantcast