Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Ludwig von Windsheim, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Titular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia


Events

DateEventTitle
3 Aug 1468AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany
3 Aug 1468AppointedTitular Bishop of Hierapolis in Phrygia
19 Nov 1480DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Regensburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Ludwig von Windsheim:
Bishop Johann Ludwig von Windsheim O.S.A. (died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Regensburg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 164
  • bp/d: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • bp/d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 219, Additions/Corrections (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015