Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop William Alnewick

Deceased

Bishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Feb 1426AppointedBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
18 Aug 1426Ordained BishopBishop of Norwich, England, Great Britain
19 Sep 1436AppointedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain
5 Dec 1449DiedBishop of Lincoln, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for William Alnewick
Bishop William Alnewick (died ) Bishop of Lincoln

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCanterbury, Archdiocese of Canterbury, England

  • a bishop for 23.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 2, Page 18, and Page 467
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 177
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 371
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 87
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 82, Number 6,674

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast